Financial history THE HANWELL AND EALING OPERATIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 802791
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021
Total gross income £39.96k £39.67k £40.30k £25.42k £4.37k
Total expenditure £38.05k £37.14k £36.02k £19.76k £2.47k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A