Trustees THE HANWELL AND EALING OPERATIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 802791
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Susan Frances YOXALL Chair 01 June 2013
None on record
Holly Marie Murphy Trustee 05 September 2021
None on record
Kelly Elayne Hardie Trustee 05 September 2021
None on record
Jennifer Louise Yoxall Trustee 07 September 2020
None on record
Vanessa Mary Plessas Trustee 07 September 2020
None on record
Michelle Samantha Spencer Trustee 07 September 2020
None on record
David Alan Nolder Trustee 09 September 2019
None on record
Gina Nicole Ackroyd Trustee 11 September 2017
None on record
Margaret Henderson PARTRIDGE Trustee
None on record
Anne Elizabeth MURPHY Trustee
None on record