Accounts and annual returns NEWHAM TRAINING AND EDUCATION CENTRE

Charity number: 802868
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021
Annual return 31 July 2020 23 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 23 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 13 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 03 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 16 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 16 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2017 13 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 13 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window