NEWHAM TRAINING AND EDUCATION CENTRE

Charity number: 802868
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £5.51m £6.52m £7.44m £6.13m £4.76m
Total expenditure £5.51m £6.44m £7.31m £7.62m £5.76m
Income from government contracts £1.03m £1.27m N/A N/A £1.02m
Income from government grants £638.62k £925.16k £4.89m £3.59m £1.65m
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £130.60k £139.66k £166.17k £185.47k £109.39k
Income - Charitable activities £5.38m £6.38m £7.27m £5.94m £4.65m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.51m £6.44m £7.31m £7.62m £5.76m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £7.33k £7.33k £7.33k £19.84k £14.49k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0