Accounts and annual returns ST JOHN PAYNE SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 802902
Charity reporting is overdue by 43 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 Overdue Overdue by 43 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Overdue Overdue by 43 days
Annual return 31 July 2022 26 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 25 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 08 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 22 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required