Financial history D J H CURRIE MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 802971
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 11/07/2018 11/07/2019 11/07/2020 11/07/2021 11/07/2022
Total gross income £65.76k £64.75k £29.68k £21.84k £33.20k
Total expenditure £65.12k £69.00k £69.21k £53.59k £55.29k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A