Accounts and annual returns THE WILLIAM HARVEY RESEARCH FOUNDATION

Charity number: 803012
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 23 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 23 November 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 14 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 02 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 20 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 23 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 23 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window