Trustees THE WILLIAM HARVEY RESEARCH FOUNDATION

Charity number: 803012
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Sir MARK CAULFIELD Trustee 03 May 2022
BRITISH PHARMACOLOGICAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE BLOOD PRESSURE ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
ANDREW JAMES HALL Trustee 03 May 2022
None on record
KATHRYN HERTEL KERLE Trustee 03 May 2022
None on record
VANELA BUSHI Trustee 03 May 2022
None on record
Dr Francesca Iolanda Gliubich Trustee 07 May 2019
None on record
PROFESSOR RODERICK JOHN FLOWER Trustee 09 October 2018
None on record
STEVEN ANDREW RALPH BATES Trustee 24 April 2018
None on record
JEREMY TIGUE Trustee 10 May 2017
None on record