BRADWELL-ON-SEA VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 803054
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £6.47k £8.83k £4.93k £5.03k £14.63k
Total expenditure £6.15k £12.80k £5.84k £7.67k £12.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A