LIGHTHOUSE FAMILY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trust provides counselling for those who are pregnant and worried, who have post abortion problems or distress about a miscarriage. Free pregnancy testing is available. The counselling is for men as well as women
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 04 April 1990: Standard registration
- ASSURE (Working name)
- LIGHTHOUSE CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LORNA JEAN CHESNEY | Chair | 11 January 2016 |
|
|||||||
KATHLEEN IRIS PLAYLE | Trustee | 27 January 2020 |
|
|||||||
PAUL WITHAMS | Trustee | 27 January 2020 |
|
|||||||
TIMOTHY KEITH PLATTS | Trustee | 11 October 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.37k | £50.40k | £24.20k | £33.08k | £25.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.85k | £37.75k | £25.78k | £40.18k | £36.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.97k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 31ST OCTOBER 1989
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WITHIN THE COUNTY OF ESSEX AND ELSEWHERE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP, DISTRESS OF SICKNESS ARISING FROM PREGNANCY, ABORTION, PHYSICAL OR SEXUAL ABUSE, THE BREAKDOWN OF FAMILY LIFE AND PERSONAL RELATIONSHIPS AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC WITHIN THE SAID COUNTY ON MATTERS RELATING TO SUCH CONDITIONS.
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF ESSEX AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 WHARF ROAD
CHELMSFORD
ESSEX
CM2 6LU
- Phone:
- 01245 494838
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window