Accounts and annual returns The Dallinghoo Church Repair Fund

Charity number: 803135
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2022 22 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 12 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 12 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 09 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 09 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2019 24 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 16 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required