Financial history CITY OF EXETER YMCA

Charity number: 803226
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £751.31k £827.49k £842.81k £1.05m £1.06m
Total expenditure £722.43k £788.77k £810.04k £928.95k £987.24k
Income from government contracts £184.24k £194.36k £212.08k £203.65k £192.45k
Income from government grants £461 £2.70k £544.78k £39.99k £68.19k
Income - Donations and legacies £81.43k £131.07k £109.01k £268.86k £279.80k
Income - Other trading activities £48.93k £40.55k £25.02k £33.55k £42.81k
Income - Charitable activities £618.29k £652.50k £706.69k £749.25k £736.39k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.65k £3.37k £2.09k £199 £24
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £654.73k £706.52k £707.68k £866.48k £946.68k
Expenditure - Raising funds £67.69k £82.25k £102.36k £62.47k £40.56k
Expenditure - Governance £8.91k £9.58k £10.61k £12.00k £13.18k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0