ST PETER'S CHURCH, ASTWOOD, FABRIC FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides financial grants towards the maintainence of St Peter's Church, Astwood.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 20 June 1990: Standard registration
- 09 August 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.65k | £2.12k | £9.91k | £1.01k | £1.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.45k | £1.55k | £900 | £884 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 19 May 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 16 September 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30TH APRIL 1990
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE PRESERVATION REPAIR AND MAINTENANCE OF THE FABRIC OF ST PETER'S CHURCH ASTWOOD AND FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE CHURCH.
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER'S, ASTWOOD.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window