BLYTHE NEIGHBOURHOOD COUNCIL

Charity number: 803485
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 March 2021 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 02 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 09 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 06 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 09 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required