Trustees YMCA West Kent

Charity number: 803529
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NICOLAS HESLOP Chair 31 January 2022
THE BRIDGE TRUST CORPORATION
Received: On time
Helen Von Trotsenburg Trustee 31 January 2022
THE BRIDGE TRUST CORPORATION
Received: On time
Gemma Buckland Trustee 31 January 2022
THE BRIDGE TRUST CORPORATION
Received: On time
Dominic Scott-Malden Trustee 25 June 2021
YMCA THAMES GATEWAY
Received: On time
Jonathan Guy LINEKER Trustee 17 March 2021
None on record
Ann Carol FURMINGER Trustee 22 May 2018
None on record
Mark Richard Farrar Trustee 21 November 2017
CROSSLIGHT ADVICE
Received: On time
Jan Peter SMITH Trustee 07 October 2014
None on record
Heather Evernden Trustee 31 January 2014
THE SOUTHBOROUGH SOCIETY
Received: On time
Lady EVANS Trustee 31 January 2014
None on record
Mrs Gerry WENHAM Trustee
None on record