THE CAIRN TERRIER RELIEF FUND

Charity number: 803599
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £238.07k £124.96k £51.39k £189.28k £172.87k
Total expenditure £43.08k £73.55k £65.25k £77.23k £71.01k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A