EPSOM COLLEGE EDUCATIONAL AWARDS TRUST

Charity number: 803630
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

1. To advance promote and encourage the education of young persons of either sex by the provision of awards in the form of: (A) Scholarships, bursaries, grants or otherwise (B) Travelling scholarships (C) Prizes. 2. For the benefit of such other exclusively charitable objects and purposes in the United Kingdom or in any other part of the world as the trustees shall in discretion think fit.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 July 1990: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • EPSOM COLLEGE (Working name)
  • EPSOM COLLEGE EDUCATION TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr ALASTAIR WELLS Chair
None on record
John Hay Trustee 15 June 2016
THE ROYAL MEDICAL FOUNDATION OF EPSOM COLLEGE
Received: On time
Andrew Pianca Trustee 15 June 2016
THE ROYAL MEDICAL FOUNDATION OF EPSOM COLLEGE
Received: On time
MOIRA HOUSE SCHOOL LIMITED
Charity is insolvent
CLIVE WATSON Trustee 15 June 2016
THE ROYAL MEDICAL FOUNDATION OF EPSOM COLLEGE
Received: On time
Richard Bruce Trustee 27 November 2013
THE ROYAL MEDICAL FOUNDATION OF EPSOM COLLEGE
Received: On time
Karen Thomas Trustee 03 January 2013
THE ROYAL MEDICAL FOUNDATION OF EPSOM COLLEGE
Received: On time
WOODLANDS SCHOOL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
EDWARD CHANDLER Trustee
None on record
SIR JOHN SCARLETT Trustee
THE FRIENDS OF THE FRENCH INSTITUTE
Received: On time
THE ROYAL MEDICAL FOUNDATION OF EPSOM COLLEGE
Received: On time
Dr JEREMY BOLTON Trustee
THE ROYAL MEDICAL FOUNDATION OF EPSOM COLLEGE
Received: On time
Dr HYWEL BOWEN-PERKINS Trustee
KINGSWOOD HOUSE SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
THE ROYAL MEDICAL FOUNDATION OF EPSOM COLLEGE
Received: On time
Lord Alexander Charles Carlile QC Trustee
THE ROYAL MEDICAL FOUNDATION OF EPSOM COLLEGE
Received: On time
Dr SUNDEEP DHILLON Trustee
THE ROYAL MEDICAL FOUNDATION OF EPSOM COLLEGE
Received: On time
DEJ MAHONEY Trustee
THE ROYAL MEDICAL FOUNDATION OF EPSOM COLLEGE
Received: On time
GEORGE PINCUS Trustee
THE ROYAL MEDICAL FOUNDATION OF EPSOM COLLEGE
Received: On time
Dr ANDREW JOHN VALLANCE-OWEN Trustee
THE ROYAL MEDICAL FOUNDATION OF EPSOM COLLEGE
Received: On time

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 28 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 07 August 2024 99 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 12 May 2023 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 30 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 24 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
SECRETARY TO COUNCIL
RMF OFFICE
EPSOM COLLEGE
EPSOM
SURREY
KT17 4JQ
Phone:
01372821011