THE ISLE OF DOGS BANGLADESHI ASSOCIATION AND CULTURAL CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The organisation HELP and SUPPORT the local mincreasing Bangladeshi community (over 200 families) by way of Advice, Information and various Activities such as: Advice Session (4 days a week Tuesday, Wednesday, Friday and Saturday); Openday Session for local Pensioners; Mother Tongue School (5 afternoons a week 5pm-7pm); Women's Group and Youth Group. We run the activities on part time basis.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 20 July 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RAFIQ HUSSAIN | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
AKROM ULLAH | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
MD NASIR UDDIN | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
MOSTOFA SORWAR | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
NURUL ISLAM KAMALI | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
DELWAR HOSSAIN | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
THUHA MUSTAFA | Trustee | 28 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
RUSHAN ALI | Trustee | 06 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nilifa Begum | Trustee | 25 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Romina Khatun | Trustee | 25 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
MATAB UDDIN | Trustee | 02 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
SHOMSU MIAH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.68k | £39.82k | £43.19k | £19.86k | £27.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.67k | £21.20k | £16.95k | £21.01k | £25.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 March 2023 | 46 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2022 | 320 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20TH JUNE 1990
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE POVERTY BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND COUNSELLING. 2. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE LANGUAGE, HISTORY AND CULTURE OF BANGLADESH. 3. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AMONGST THE INHABITANTS OF TOWER HAMLETS IN PARTICULAR AMONG BANGLADESHI PEOPLE BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO OBTAIN EMPLOYMENT. 4. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION OF OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE INHABITANTS OF TOWER HAMLETS IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 5. TO RELIEVE PERSONS SUFFERING FROM NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS IN PARTICULAR THOSE RESIDENT IN BANGLADESH AND ETHIOPIA.
Area of benefit
YOWER HAMLETS
Contact information
- Address:
-
LONDON BOROUGH OF TOWER HAMLETS
CUBITT TOWN LIBRARY
STRATTONDALE STREET
LONDON
E14 3HG
- Phone:
- 02075361650
- Email:
- IODBANGLADESHI@AOL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window