SANTANDER UK FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grantmaking to UK charities working within the published charitable priorities of the Santander Foundation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Guernsey
- Isle Of Man
- Jersey
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 17 June 1990: Standard registration
- 11 May 2022: Funds received from 1175953 NFOQUE UK FOUNDATION
- SANTANDER FOUNDATION (Working name)
- SANTANDER UK FOUNDATION LIMITED (Working name)
- THE DISCOVERY FOUNDATION (Working name)
- ABBEY NATIONAL CHARITABLE TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Judith Mary Moran | Chair | 22 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Hannah Elizabeth Cameron | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Inskip | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Elizabeth Clapham | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carlos Tapia Montes | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Danny Jones | Trustee | 22 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.49m | £4.39m | £3.68m | £3.36m | £500.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.19m | £3.45m | £2.31m | £2.14m | £3.53m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £3.08m | £4.04m | £3.33m | £3.00m | £100.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £415.05k | £351.61k | £346.64k | £356.05k | £366.88k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.19m | £3.45m | £2.31m | £2.14m | £3.53m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £12.36k | £6.18k | £27.72k | £28.89k | £151.47k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £1.99m | £3.31m | £2.12m | £1.92m | £3.15m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £16.02m | £16.53m | £17.42m | £15.50m | £17.03m | |
|
Other assets | £2.30m | £3.02m | £4.55m | £5.86m | £3.29m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £141.31k | £16.86k | £173.46k | £612.44k | £1.44m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/06/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/05/2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11/01/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/10/2014 as amended on 18 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
TO SUPPORT SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS, "NOT FOR PROFIT ORGANISATIONS" AND COMMUNITY INTEREST COMPANIES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE CONCERNED WITH THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS, THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION, THE RELIEF OF SUFFERING OF ANIMALS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT PROVIDED THAT ANY SUCH SUPPORT SHALL BE CONDITIONED UPON IT BE APPLIED SOLELY FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Santander Uk Plc
Unity Place
200 Grafton Gate
MILTON KEYNES
MK9 1UP
- Phone:
- 07922577773
- Email:
- grants@santander.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window