THE CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF ARBITRATORS

Charity number: 803725
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £7.12m £7.04m £7.57m £7.51m £7.90m
Total expenditure £6.80m £6.38m £6.83m £7.24m £7.48m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £4.26m £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £558.37k £663.50k £779.56k £666.70k £684.75k
Income - Charitable activities £2.12m £6.31m £6.72m £6.77m £7.14m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £65.32k £59.05k £71.27k £78.02k £76.85k
Income - Other £116.26k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.62m £5.89m £6.31m £6.56m £6.68m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £483.05k £518.68k £682.44k £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £330.02k £417.77k £480.36k £62.94k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £25.43k £0 £0 £0 £800.15k