THE CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF ARBITRATORS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal object for which the Institute is established and incorporated is to promote and facilitate worldwide the determination of disputes by arbitration and alternative means of private dispute resolution other than resolution by the court. The main beneficiaries of the work carried out by the Institute are its members and the general public, both in the United Kingdom and elsewhere.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£9,027,889
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £5.86m | |
Other trading activities | £697.51k | |
Investments | £88.05k | |
Other | £2.38m |
Total expenditure:
£9,015,882
Raising funds | £917.88k | |
Charitable activities | £8.10m | |
Other | £0 |
-£56,331 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £917.88k | |
Charitable expenditure | £8.10m | |
Retained for future use | £12.01k |
People

99 Employee(s)
15 Trustee(s)
1000 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 5 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£80k to £90k | 3 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Albania
- Andorra
- Antigua And Barbuda
- Australia
- Austria
- Barbados
- Belgium
- Bermuda
- Brazil
- British Virgin Islands
- Croatia
- Cyprus
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Egypt
- France
- Germany
- Gibraltar
- Greece
- Guernsey
- Hong Kong
- India
- Ireland
- Isle Of Man
- Italy
- Jersey
- Kenya
- Kuwait
- Latvia
- Lebanon
- Luxembourg
- Malaysia
- Malta
- Mauritius
- Moldova
- Monaco
- Montenegro
- Netherlands
- Nigeria
- Northern Ireland
- Norway
- Pakistan
- Philippines
- Poland
- Portugal
- Qatar
- Romania
- Russia
- Saudi Arabia
- Scotland
- Singapore
- Slovakia
- South Africa
- South Korea
- Spain
- Sri Lanka
- St Lucia
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Thailand
- The Bahamas
- Trinidad And Tobago
- Turkey
- Ukraine
- United Arab Emirates
- United States
- Vietnam
- Zambia
Governance
- 19 July 1990: Standard registration
- CIARB (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anna Stylianou | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Peter O'Malley | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Saad Hegazy | Trustee | 06 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rama Sridhar | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anita Kimber | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nighat Dad | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Charles Lagana Putz | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ron C Hamilton | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chikwendu Madumere | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ben Giaretta | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Kenny KC | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Huebner | Trustee | 05 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Barrett | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Miller KC | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Greenwood | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.90m | £6.87m | £7.32m | £8.22m | £9.03m | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.48m | £5.81m | £6.71m | £8.36m | £9.02m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £684.75k | £0 | £0 | £418.48k | £697.51k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £7.14m | £6.83m | £6.74m | £7.76m | £5.86m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £76.85k | £31.42k | £17.07k | £36.86k | £88.05k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £564.69k | £0 | £2.38m | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £6.68m | £5.81m | £6.13m | £7.66m | £8.10m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £707.84k | £917.88k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £62.94k | £0 | £91.81k | £393.18k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £800.15k | £0 | £584.91k | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £6.46m | £6.41m | £6.71m | £7.47m | £7.87m | |
|
Long-term investments | £1.61m | £1.60m | £1.72m | £1.76m | £1.20m | |
|
Other assets | £3.97m | £4.24m | £3.33m | £5.16m | £4.37m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £3.81m | £3.12m | £2.44m | £4.43m | £3.72m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 06 FEB 1979 AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 20 OCT 1982 AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 05 OCT 1983 AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 26 JUN 1991 AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 22 JUN 1999 AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 25 SEP 2006 AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 04 JUL 2012 AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 06 AUG 2013 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 15 FEB 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND FACILITATE WORLDWIDE THE DETERMINATION OF DISPUTES BY ALL FORMS OF PRIVATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION OTHER THAN RESOLUTION BY THE COURT (COLLECTIVELY CALLED “PRIVATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION”).
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chartered Institute of Arbitrators
12-14 Bloomsbury Square
LONDON
WC1A 2LP
- Phone:
- 0207 421 7444
- Email:
- legal@ciarb.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window