EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION OF JACOB SIMPSON AND MARY HEY

Charity number: 810053
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
KERRY SHIREEN STEWART Chair
CHARITY OF JOSEPH LEPTON Received: On time
JACOB SIMPSON AND MARY HEY Received: On time
Christine Porter Trustee 24 October 2017
CHARITY OF JOSEPH LEPTON Received: On time
JACOB SIMPSON AND MARY HEY Received: On time
Ann Cooper Trustee 28 April 2015
CHARITY OF JOSEPH LEPTON Received: On time
JACOB SIMPSON AND MARY HEY Received: On time
DIANE CAROL HANWELL Trustee 10 January 2013
CHARITY OF JOSEPH LEPTON Received: On time
JACOB SIMPSON AND MARY HEY Received: On time
Anne Dalton Trustee 08 April 2014
CHARITY OF JOSEPH LEPTON Received: On time
JACOB SIMPSON AND MARY HEY Received: On time
Duncan Whittaker Trustee 24 October 2017
CHARITY OF JOSEPH LEPTON Received: On time
Dawn Seary Trustee 12 October 2021
BOROUGH OF PUDSEY CHARITY Received: On time
CHARITY OF JOSEPH LEPTON Received: On time
JACOB SIMPSON AND MARY HEY Received: On time