1ST ESHER FRIENDS OF GUIDING

Charity number: 810118
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 04 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 April 2021 155 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 04 April 2021 155 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 12 March 2020 133 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 06 March 2019 126 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 17 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required