THE CHARITY OF HENRY PEARLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For those suffering hardship or embarking on education beyond 16 or a new apprenticeship who live in the civil parishes of Callow, Dewsall, Haywood, Ridgehill and Grafton.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 16 April 1963: Standard registration
- 09 August 2014: Removed (Does not operate)
- 02 September 2014: Re-registered
- HENRY DEARLE (Previous name)
- HENRY PEARLE (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Mark Johnson | Trustee | 17 November 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||
BRYAN JOHN THOMAS | Trustee | 18 November 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||||
JANICE NASH | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||||
XANTHE SOPHIA GLOVER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||
MALCOLM GEOFFREY BARRELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £200 | £92 | £4 | £336 | £1.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £350 | £360 | £457 | £485 | £725 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 November 2024 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 6 APRIL 1998.
Charitable objects
FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR OF THE PARISH OF CALLOW, DEWSALL, GRAFTON AND HAYWARD WITH A PREFERENCE FOR PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF CALLOW.
Area of benefit
THE PARISHES OF CALLOW, DEWSALL, GRAFTON AND HAYWOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Becket House
Much Birch
Hereford
HR2 8HT
- Phone:
- 01981 540390
- Email:
- revmark100@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window