ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES OF JAMES SOUTH AND WILLIAM BURBERRY

Charity number: 810227
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 31 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 03 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 03 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 11 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 11 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 14 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 14 May 2017 On time Download