ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES OF JAMES SOUTH AND WILLIAM BURBERRY

Charity number: 810227
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Thelwall Trustee 06 March 2014 None on record
Margaret Mary Murray-Smith Trustee 22 June 2017
THE CIO OF JAMES SOUTH AND WILLIAM BURBERRY Recently registered
Richard Arthur Douglas Noble Trustee
THE CIO OF JAMES SOUTH AND WILLIAM BURBERRY Recently registered
Rev Pamela Hilary Siddall Trustee 04 June 2015
THE CIO OF JAMES SOUTH AND WILLIAM BURBERRY Recently registered
ST NEOTS AND HUNTINGDON METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT Received: On time
Mrs ANGIE BRUCE Trustee 16 October 2013 None on record
MR John Molyneaux Trustee 06 March 2014 None on record
BETTY DIANE MILLARD Trustee
THE CIO OF JAMES SOUTH AND WILLIAM BURBERRY Recently registered
ALEC MACANDREW Chair 06 September 2011 None on record