THOMAS AND EDWARD CRAWLEY

Charity number: 810332
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 November 2020 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 09 November 2020 375 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 06 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 15 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required