Financial history MOOR MEADOW CHARITY

Charity number: 810353
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £778 £1.61k £1.26k £959 £1.34k
Total expenditure £434 £463 £474 £359 £501
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A