THE GIRLS ENDOWMENT FUND

Charity number: 810355
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 November 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 13 March 2020 134 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 06 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required