CHURCH CHARITY

Charity number: 810367
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £8.61k £9.64k £7.71k £13.92k £6.08k
Total expenditure £7.30k £6.46k £9.42k £4.80k £13.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A