Trustees CHURCH CHARITY
Charity number: 810367
Charity reporting is overdue by 149 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philomena Mary Porter | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Thomas | Trustee | 19 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Christine Furmston | Trustee | 27 January 2016 |
|
|||||
Michael Birrell | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR OSBORNE | Trustee | 03 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Canon SHAMUS WILLIAMS | Trustee | 03 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
BARRY John HOLME | Trustee | 03 July 2013 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.