PAKENHAM TOWN ESTATE

Charity number: 810381
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £15.52k £15.98k £16.53k £16.82k £17.16k
Total expenditure £17.27k £16.06k £16.06k £17.58k £16.95k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A