PAKENHAM TOWN ESTATE

Charity number: 810381
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Martin David Harrison Trustee 01 January 2021
TOWN ESTATE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
Cedric Palfrey Trustee 07 May 2015
TOWN ESTATE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
Rev KATHERINE VALENTINE Chair 17 June 2011
PAKENHAM CHARITIES Received: On time
TOWN ESTATE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
Anne Harrison Trustee 05 December 2016
TOWN ESTATE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
DEREK DORLING Trustee 01 May 1995
PAKENHAM CHARITIES Received: On time
TOWN ESTATE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time