Financial history CANTILENA

Charity number: 900021
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £6.91k £6.60k £5.88k £2.43k £3.18k
Total expenditure £6.78k £6.52k £5.85k £2.89k £2.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A