NAILSEA COMMUNITY TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BENEFIT THE INHABITANTS OF THE TOWN OF NAILSEA AND SURROUNDING PARISHES TO EDUCATE AND ASSIST YOUNG PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS, TO EDUCATE PERSONS OF ALL AGES IN THE ARTS, SCIENCE, RELIGION, COMMERCE AND HEALTH CARE, AND TO RELIEVE POVERTY AMONGST PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- North Somerset
Governance
- 13 July 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NANCY ELLEN ELLIOTT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Gillian Hyacinth Gray | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth Sleigh | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Worviell | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter James Massam | Trustee | 30 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew George Baker | Trustee | 12 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Joyce Sly | Trustee | 06 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANN JENNIFER TONKIN | Trustee | 16 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
CYNTHIA AVERIL DOBSON | Trustee | 14 November 2013 |
|
|||||
Dr Martin Elford MB BS | Trustee |
|
||||||
ALAN SHAW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT GREGORY WESTLAKE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.31k | £4.65k | £5.23k | £9.29k | £9.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.25k | £7.73k | £24.13k | £35.38k | £19.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 August 2024 | 203 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 15TH NOVEMBER 1988 as amended on 28 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE TOWN OF NAILSEA AND SURROUNDING AREAS IN THE COUNTY OF AVON AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) FOR THE PURPOSES TO EDUCATE AND ASSIST YOUNG PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES, TO EDUCATE PERSONS OF ALL AGES IN THE ARTS, SCIENCE, RELIGION, COMMERCE AND HEALTH CARE, AND TO RELIEVE POVERTY AMONGST PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
NAILSEA AND SURROUNDING AREAS IN THE COUNTY OF AVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Scout Association
1st Nailsea Scout Group
Clevedon Road
Nailsea
BRISTOL
BS48 1EH
- Phone:
- 01275856472
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window