BODY POSITIVE DORSET

Charity number: 900089
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £79.78k £57.50k £31.57k £29.77k £303.44k
Total expenditure £82.86k £69.58k £58.30k £51.63k £78.95k
Income from government contracts £50.02k £5.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £16.46k N/A N/A