THE CHURCH OF THE HOLY SPIRIT/RESEARCH AND ENLIGHTENMENT CENTRE TRUST

Charity number: 900101
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Louise Roseby Trustee 11 December 2020 None on record
JEAN WHEATLEY Trustee 12 March 2013 None on record
Robert James Collins Trustee 11 December 2020 None on record
Mary Collins Trustee 11 December 2020 None on record
Susan Joyce Clayden Trustee 24 November 2017 None on record
Martin Roseby Trustee 11 December 2020 None on record
Beryl Ellen Kitney Trustee 11 December 2020 None on record
Patricia Rooney Trustee 09 April 2021 None on record
Gwen Cock Trustee 28 December 2018 None on record