BASSETTS FARM PRESCHOOL

Charity number: 900102
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £128.93k £139.40k £151.28k £149.79k £150.89k
Total expenditure £133.07k £135.64k £150.86k £152.75k £150.60k
Income from government contracts £107.52k £110.20k £137.72k £132.66k £137.89k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A