BASSETTS FARM PRESCHOOL

Charity number: 900102
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jayne Marchant Trustee 13 April 2015 None on record
Daniel Moore Chair 11 October 2017 None on record
KAREN BAMSEY Trustee 02 November 2016 None on record
KELLY WILKS Trustee 10 October 2018 None on record
lisa clements Trustee 28 October 2019 None on record
Jodie Parker Trustee 13 April 2015 None on record