THE FRIENDS OF SAINT GREGORY'S CATHOLIC COMPREHENSIVE SCHOOL ENRICHMENT FUND

Charity number: 900124
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 28 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 18 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 23 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 28 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 15 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required