Financial history THE FRIENDS OF HIGHCLIFFE PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 900343
Charity reporting is overdue by 77 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023
Total gross income £21.67k £9.22k £9.74k £20.11k £41.00k
Total expenditure £28.00k £2.64k £729 £16.75k £20.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A