Financial history ST NICHOLAS PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP - HURST

Charity number: 900344
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £109.90k £121.13k £139.80k £139.92k £142.35k
Total expenditure £89.89k £107.98k £148.84k £119.62k £133.33k
Income from government contracts £66.16k £82.32k £93.33k £94.83k £101.35k
Income from government grants £0 N/A £7.00k £7.00k N/A