BLACK ELDERS DAY CENTRE OF GLOUCESTER

Charity number: 900388
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 16 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 27 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 27 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 12 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 12 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 18 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 18 July 2016 On time Download