THE FRIENDS OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST CHURCH, KEYNSHAM

Charity number: 900401
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN MICHAEL GARSIDE Trustee 24 June 2018 None on record
Keith James Norton Trustee 08 July 2021 None on record
Deborah Jane Shore Trustee 27 June 2021 None on record
LESLEY GERALDINE ORGAN Chair 26 June 2016 None on record
PAULINE PARTRIDGE Trustee 24 June 2018 None on record
EDMUND MERVYN PRIDEAUX Trustee
KEYNSHAM AND DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION Received: On time
JOHN FREDERICK LYE Trustee None on record
Julian Drummond Anderson Trustee 24 June 2012
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF KEYNSHAM Received: On time
Rev STEPHEN ARAGORN M'CAW Trustee 26 June 2016
JOHN BOWLES Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF KEYNSHAM Received: On time
THE ARCHDEACONRY OF BATH CLERICAL FAMILIES FUND Recently registered
STEPHEN ANDREW SCOTT Trustee 26 June 2016 None on record