E B EDUCATION TRUST LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Buckinghamshire
- Slough
Governance
- 17 May 1990: Standard registration
- 07 December 2005: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- EAST BERKSHIRE COLLEGE TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- LANGLEY COLLEGE TRUST (Previous name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18TH APRIL 1990 AND AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 25 JANUARY 1995
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING VOCATIONAL TRAINING) OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS AND FACILITIES CALCULATED TO ACHIEVE SUCH OBJECTS AT LANGLEY COLLEGE IN SLOUGH AND OTHER ESTABLISHMENTS OF FURTHER EDUCATION AND OTHERWISE AS THE COMPANY THINKS FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window