Trustees PETERSFIELD MUSICAL FESTIVAL

Charity number: 900489
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Pamela Jeanne Buckley Chair 24 September 2020
None on record
Richard Charles Innes Stoneman Trustee 10 May 2023
None on record
Simon O'Hea Trustee 26 January 2022
THE BERNADETTE CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE RENAISSANCE CHOIR
Received: On time
THE FESTIVAL OF CHICHESTER
Received: On time
Susan Wyn Bint Trustee 11 November 2020
None on record
Simon Jonathan Mason Trustee 24 September 2020
PACT FOOD BANK
Received: On time
PETERSFIELD CHORAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
PETERSFIELD AREA HISTORICAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
Sarah Josephine Hard Trustee 19 September 2019
None on record
Geoffrey Michael John Culbertson Trustee 15 September 2017
None on record
Robert Alan Walker Trustee 15 September 2017
None on record
Sheila Kay Rowe Trustee 23 September 2016
None on record
Tony Newberry Trustee 21 January 2015
None on record
MARCIA JANE FIELDEN Trustee 07 December 2011
None on record
NANCY ELIZABETH BUCK Trustee
ALTON CHORAL SOCIETY
Overdue by 23 days
ALTON METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
ADRIAN PHILIP YOUNG Trustee
None on record
MS SALLY MAYBURY Trustee
ROGATE CHORAL SOCIETY
Received: On time