Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF BOURTON SCHOOL

Charity number: 900503
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 01 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 01 October 2021 93 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 16 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 16 October 2019 108 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 28 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required