Financial history COURT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (TUFFLEY)

Charity number: 900515
Charity reporting is overdue by 629 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/12/2021
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £61.00k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £58.00k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A £10.00k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £45.00k