EXMOOR SINGERS

Charity number: 900587
Charity reporting is overdue by 1510 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 49 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 49 days
Annual return 30 September 2019 Overdue Overdue by 414 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Overdue Overdue by 414 days
Annual return 30 September 2018 Overdue Overdue by 780 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Overdue Overdue by 780 days
Annual return 30 September 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1145 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1145 days
Annual return 30 September 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1510 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1510 days