DAYSPRING CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity supports a number of people working in overseas mission. We also support and host activities within our objects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Devon
- Leeds City
- India
- Turkey
- Uzbekistan
Governance
- 20 August 1990: Standard registration
- DAYSPRING CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bela Singh | Trustee | 13 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN THORNBOROUGH | Trustee | 07 December 2015 |
|
|||||
ANNE ROSEMARY SIMKINS | Trustee | 18 March 2001 |
|
|||||
ROGER MARTIN KIRBY | Trustee | 03 June 1990 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.23k | £13.56k | £12.87k | £8.49k | £2.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.61k | £15.29k | £10.68k | £11.28k | £2.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 3RD JUNE 1990
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE DEVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 SANDYBANK AVENUE
ROTHWELL
LEEDS
LS26 0ER
- Phone:
- 01132827829
- Email:
- RMSEKIRBY@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window